|
08/27/2009
|
In committee: Held under submission.
|
|
|
|
08/24/2009
|
In committee: Placed on Appropriations suspense file.
|
|
|
|
07/15/2009
|
Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
07/14/2009
|
From committee: Amend, do pass as amended, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 3.) (July 8).
|
|
|
|
07/01/2009
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
|
06/23/2009
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
|
06/16/2009
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
06/11/2009
|
Referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
|
05/28/2009
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
05/28/2009
|
Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 48. Noes 28. Page 1753.)
|
|
|
|
05/26/2009
|
Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
05/21/2009
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 11. Noes 4.) (May 20).
|
|
|
|
04/30/2009
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
04/29/2009
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
04/28/2009
|
From committee: Amend, do pass as amended, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 3.) (April 22).
|
|
|
|
04/20/2009
|
Re-referred to Com. on INS.
|
|
|
|
04/16/2009
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on INS. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
04/15/2009
|
From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on INS. Re-referred. (Ayes 10. Noes 6.) (April 14).
|
|
|
|
04/02/2009
|
Referred to Coms. on HEALTH and INS.
|
|
|
|
03/02/2009
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
|
03/01/2009
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 30.
|
|
|
|
02/27/2009
|
Introduced. To print.
|
|
|