California 2009-2010 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB1525 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 27, 2009

Enrolled

Bill September 10, 2009

Chaptered

Bill October 11, 2009

Amended

Bill June 25, 2009
Bill June 9, 2009