California 2009-2010 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB1531 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 27, 2009

Amended

Bill June 23, 2010
Bill September 4, 2009
Bill July 1, 2009
Bill June 10, 2009
Bill April 28, 2009