California 2009-2010 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB1532 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 27, 2009

Enrolled

Bill July 2, 2010

Chaptered

Bill July 19, 2010

Amended

Bill February 24, 2010
Bill January 4, 2010
Bill April 14, 2009