02/11/2010 | Referred to Com. on P.E. & R. | |||
01/28/2010 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | |||
01/27/2010 | Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 45. Noes 23. Page 3906.) | |||
01/25/2010 | Read second time. To third reading. | |||
01/21/2010 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (January 21). | |||
01/06/2010 | From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Re-referred. (Ayes 4. Noes 0.) (January 6). | |||
01/05/2010 | Re-referred to Com. on P.E.,R. & S.S. Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Ayes 41. Noes 23. Page 3694.) | |||
01/04/2010 | Referred to Com. on P.E.,R. & S.S. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on P.E.,R. & S.S. Read second time and amended. | |||
03/02/2009 | Read first time. | |||
03/01/2009 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 30. | |||
02/27/2009 | Introduced. To print. |