02/02/2010 | From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56. | |||
01/31/2010 | Died pursuant to Art. IV, Sec. 10(c) of the Constitution. | |||
04/28/2009 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Held without recommendation. | |||
04/21/2009 | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. | |||
04/02/2009 | Referred to Com. on B. & P. | |||
03/02/2009 | Read first time. | |||
03/01/2009 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 30. | |||
02/27/2009 | Introduced. To print. |