California 2009-2010 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB1535 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 27, 2009

Enrolled

Bill September 23, 2009

Chaptered

Bill October 11, 2009

Amended

Bill September 2, 2009
Bill July 16, 2009
Bill July 9, 2009
Bill April 20, 2009