|
02/02/2010
|
Died on third reading file.
|
|
|
|
01/26/2010
|
From inactive file. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
01/25/2010
|
Notice of intention to remove from inactive file given by Assembly Member Block.
|
|
|
|
06/01/2009
|
To inactive file on motion of Assembly Member Ma.
|
|
|
|
05/14/2009
|
Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
05/13/2009
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
|
|
|
|
05/12/2009
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (May 6).
|
|
|
|
04/30/2009
|
Re-referred to Com. on ED.
|
|
|
|
04/29/2009
|
In committee: Set, second hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on ED. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
04/22/2009
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
04/20/2009
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on ED. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
04/02/2009
|
Referred to Com. on ED.
|
|
|
|
03/02/2009
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
|
03/01/2009
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 30.
|
|
|
|
02/27/2009
|
Introduced. To print.
|
|
|