|
10/11/2009
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 542, Statutes of 2009.
|
|
|
|
10/11/2009
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/29/2009
|
Enrolled and to the Governor at 3:30 p.m.
|
|
|
|
09/08/2009
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To enrollment. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 3106.)
|
|
|
|
09/03/2009
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 5 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
|
09/02/2009
|
Read third time, passed, and to Assembly. (Ayes 34. Noes 0. Page 2103.)
|
|
|
|
08/19/2009
|
Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/18/2009
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
|
07/23/2009
|
From committee: Amend, do pass as amended, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (July 15). Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR. (Corrected September 8.)
|
|
|
|
07/06/2009
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
|
06/28/2009
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
06/16/2009
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
|
06/11/2009
|
Referred to Com. on HEALTH. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
|
05/28/2009
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
05/28/2009
|
Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 1754.)
|
|
|
|
05/21/2009
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (May 20).
|
|
|
|
05/14/2009
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
05/13/2009
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
05/12/2009
|
From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. Re-referred. (Ayes 19. Noes 0.) (May 12).
|
|
|
|
05/06/2009
|
Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
|
05/05/2009
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
04/13/2009
|
Referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
|
03/05/2009
|
From printer. May be heard in committee April 4.
|
|
|
|
03/04/2009
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|