05/21/2009 | Referred to Com. on B., F. & I. | |||
05/11/2009 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | |||
05/11/2009 | Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 1368.) | |||
05/06/2009 | Read second time. To Consent Calendar. | |||
05/05/2009 | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (May 4). | |||
04/13/2009 | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. | |||
04/02/2009 | Referred to Com. on B. & F. | |||
03/10/2009 | From printer. May be heard in committee April 9. | |||
03/09/2009 | Read first time. To print. |