|
08/06/2009
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 153, Statutes of 2009.
|
|
|
|
08/05/2009
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
07/30/2009
|
Enrolled and to the Governor at 2:30 p.m.
|
|
|
|
07/01/2009
|
Withdrawn from Governor. Ordered returned to enrollment.
|
|
|
|
06/25/2009
|
Enrolled and to the Governor at 1:30 p.m.
|
|
|
|
06/22/2009
|
In Assembly. To enrollment.
|
|
|
|
06/22/2009
|
Read third time, passed, and to Assembly. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 1376.)
|
|
|
|
06/17/2009
|
Read second time. To Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
|
06/16/2009
|
From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (June 16).
|
|
|
|
05/21/2009
|
Referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
|
05/11/2009
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
05/11/2009
|
Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 1368.)
|
|
|
|
05/05/2009
|
From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (May 4).
|
|
|
|
04/21/2009
|
From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on B. & F. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. Re-referred. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (April 21).
|
|
|
|
04/15/2009
|
Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
|
04/13/2009
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on JUD. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
04/02/2009
|
Referred to Coms. on JUD. and B. & F.
|
|
|
|
03/10/2009
|
From printer. May be heard in committee April 9.
|
|
|
|
03/09/2009
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|