|
08/31/2010
|
Re-referred to Com. on RLS. Senate Rule 29.3(b) suspended. (Ayes 21. Noes 13. Page 5083.) From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 3. Noes 2.) (August 31). Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/30/2010
|
From committee: Return to Senate floor for consideration. (Ayes 6. Noes 4.) Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/27/2010
|
In committee: Testimony taken. Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
|
08/24/2010
|
From committee: That pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10, the measure be re-referred to the Com. on APPR pursuant to Joint Rule 10.5. (Ayes 3. Noes 1.) Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
08/23/2010
|
Read second time. To third reading. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10. From committee: Be re-referred to Com. on L. GOV. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10. (Ayes 3. Noes 0.) Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV.
|
|
|
|
08/20/2010
|
Read third time, amended. To second reading.
|
|
|
|
08/20/2010
|
Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/19/2010
|
From inactive file. To second reading.
|
|
|
|
06/14/2010
|
To inactive file on motion of Senator DeSaulnier.
|
|
|
|
06/01/2010
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
05/28/2010
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 6. Noes 4.) (May 27).
|
|
|
|
05/24/2010
|
In committee: Placed on APPR suspense file.
|
|
|
|
05/20/2010
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
04/20/2010
|
From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Re-referred. (Ayes 3. Noes 2.) (April 19).
|
|
|
|
04/15/2010
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Page 3209.)
|
|
|
|
07/08/2009
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Testimony taken. Further hearing to be set.
|
|
|
|
07/01/2009
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on L. GOV.
|
|
|
|
06/18/2009
|
Referred to Com. on L. GOV.
|
|
|
|
06/04/2009
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
06/03/2009
|
Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 47. Noes 25. Page 2030.)
|
|
|
|
06/01/2009
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
|
|
|
|
05/29/2009
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (May 28).
|
|
|
|
05/06/2009
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
|
04/23/2009
|
From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Re-referred. (Ayes 4. Noes 3.) (April 22).
|
|
|
|
03/31/2009
|
Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV.
|
|
|
|
03/27/2009
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on L. GOV. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
01/27/2009
|
From printer. May be heard in committee February 26.
|
|
|
|
01/26/2009
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|