|
08/06/2009
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 154, Statutes of 2009.
|
|
|
|
08/05/2009
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
07/30/2009
|
Enrolled and to the Governor at 2:30 p.m.
|
|
|
|
07/09/2009
|
In Assembly. To enrollment.
|
|
|
|
07/09/2009
|
Read third time, passed, and to Assembly. (Ayes 34. Noes 0. Page 1669.)
|
|
|
|
07/02/2009
|
Ordered to Special Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
|
07/01/2009
|
Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
06/30/2009
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (June 29).
|
|
|
|
06/18/2009
|
From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on APPR with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. Re-referred. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (June 17).
|
|
|
|
05/21/2009
|
Referred to Com. on B., F. & I.
|
|
|
|
05/14/2009
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
05/14/2009
|
Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 73. Noes 0. Page 1471.)
|
|
|
|
05/11/2009
|
Read second time. To Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
|
05/07/2009
|
From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (May 6).
|
|
|
|
04/22/2009
|
Read second time. To Consent Calendar. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. pursuant to Joint Rule 10.5.
|
|
|
|
04/21/2009
|
From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (April 20).
|
|
|
|
04/16/2009
|
Re-referred to Com. on B. & F.
|
|
|
|
04/15/2009
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on B. & F. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
04/13/2009
|
Re-referred to Com. on B. & F. by unanimous consent.
|
|
|
|
04/02/2009
|
Referred to Coms. on W.,P. & W. and B. & F.
|
|
|
|
03/11/2009
|
From printer. May be heard in committee April 11.
|
|
|
|
03/10/2009
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|