|
10/11/2009
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 336, Statutes of 2009.
|
|
|
|
10/11/2009
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/04/2009
|
Enrolled and to the Governor at 2 p.m.
|
|
|
|
08/31/2009
|
Urgency clause adopted. Senate amendments concurred in. To enrollment. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 2808.)
|
|
|
|
08/27/2009
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 30 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
|
08/27/2009
|
Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed and to Assembly. (Ayes 35. Noes 0. Page 1972.)
|
|
|
|
08/25/2009
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/24/2009
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and be amended.
|
|
|
|
07/16/2009
|
Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
07/15/2009
|
From committee: Amend, do pass as amended, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (July 7).
|
|
|
|
07/01/2009
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
|
05/27/2009
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on E., U., & C.
|
|
|
|
05/21/2009
|
Referred to Com. on E., U., & C.
|
|
|
|
05/14/2009
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
05/14/2009
|
Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 73. Noes 0. Page 1471.)
|
|
|
|
05/11/2009
|
Read second time. To Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
|
05/07/2009
|
From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (May 6).
|
|
|
|
04/30/2009
|
From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Re-referred. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (April 27).
|
|
|
|
04/02/2009
|
Referred to Com. on U. & C.
|
|
|
|
03/11/2009
|
From printer. May be heard in committee April 11.
|
|
|
|
03/10/2009
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|