|
08/23/2010
|
Withdrawn from committee. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
|
08/20/2010
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
08/02/2010
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
07/15/2010
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended, and re-refer to Com. on APPR with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (June 29). Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
05/21/2009
|
Referred to Com. on E., U., & C.
|
|
|
|
05/14/2009
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
05/14/2009
|
Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 73. Noes 0. Page 1471.)
|
|
|
|
05/11/2009
|
Read second time. To Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
|
05/07/2009
|
From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (May 6).
|
|
|
|
04/29/2009
|
From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. Re-referred. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (April 27).
|
|
|
|
04/02/2009
|
Referred to Com. on U. & C.
|
|
|
|
03/11/2009
|
From printer. May be heard in committee April 11.
|
|
|
|
03/10/2009
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|