California 2009 2009-2010 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB1552 Amended / Bill

Filed 08/20/2010

 BILL NUMBER: AB 1552AMENDED BILL TEXT AMENDED IN SENATE AUGUST 20, 2010 AMENDED IN SENATE JULY 15, 2010 INTRODUCED BY Committee on Utilities and Commerce (  Fuentes   Bradford  (Chair), Duvall (Vice Chair), Blakeslee, Buchanan, Carter, Fong, Furutani, Huffman, Krekorian, Smyth, and Torrico) MARCH 10, 2009  An act to amend Sections 398.2, 398.3, 398.4, and 398.5 of the Public Utilities Code, relating to energy.   An act to add Section 13142.6 to the Water Code, relating to water.  LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST AB 1552, as amended, Committee on Utilities and Commerce.  Electricity.   Water: coastal powerplants.   Existing law establishes the policy of the state with respect to water quality as it relates to the coastal marine environment.   This bill would provide that for a municipally owned coastal powerplant that is not new, as defined, the best available technology for a municipally owned powerplant shall be evaluated on a facility-wide basis using design flow. The bill would also provide that considerations regarding the feasibility of installing the best available technology shall rely on a specified definition of "feasibility." The bill would require the State Water Resources Control Board's statewide water quality control policy on the use of coastal and estuarine waters for powerplant cooling to allow municipally owned coastal powerplants to comply with certain requirements.   The California Renewables Portfolio Standard Program requires the Public Utilities Commission to implement annual procurement targets for the procurement of eligible renewable energy resources, as defined, for all retail sellers, as defined, to achieve the targets and goals of the program. Existing law establishes a separate program under which retail suppliers of electricity disclose accurate, reliable, and simple to understand information on the generation attributes of the electricity they propose to sell, including eligible renewables, as defined. Existing law provides that a retail supplier that does not make any claims that identify its electricity sources as different than net system power, as defined, is authorized to disclose net system electricity sources.   This bill would replace the term "retail supplier" with "retail seller" and would replace the term "eligible renewables" with "eligible renewable energy resources" in the later described program and would incorporate definitions for those terms that are applicable to the California Renewables Portfolio Standard Program. The bill would make other nonsubstantive changes.  Vote: majority. Appropriation: no. Fiscal committee:  no   yes  . State-mandated local program: no. THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA DO ENACT AS FOLLOWS:  SECTION 1.   Section 13142.6 is added to the   Water Code   , to read:   13142.6. (a) For a municipally owned coastal powerplant that is not new, as defined in Section 125.83 of Title 40 of the Code of Federal Regulations as of July 1, 2007, the best available technology shall be evaluated on a facility-wide basis using design flow. (b) Considerations regarding the feasibility of installing the best available technology for a municipally owned powerplant shall rely on the definition of feasibility set forth in Section 21061.1 of the Public Resources Code. (c) The implementation schedule contained in the State Water Resources Control Board's statewide water quality control policy on the use of coastal and estuarine waters for powerplant cooling, adopted May 4, 2010, and any subsequent policy modifying the May 4, 2010, policy, shall allow municipally owned coastal powerplants, until December 31, 2031, to comply unless the system or local reliability will be jeopardized by this date, in which case the provisions for compliance date suspensions or modifications contained in the policy shall apply.  All matter deleted in this version of the bill appears in the bill as amended in the Senate, July 15, 2010. (JR11)