|
07/24/2009
|
Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed and to Assembly. (Ayes 36. Noes 3. Page 1808.)
|
|
|
|
07/23/2009
|
Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
07/16/2009
|
Read third time, amended. To second reading.
|
|
|
|
07/08/2009
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (July 7).
|
|
|
|
07/02/2009
|
Re-referred to Com. on E., U., & C.
|
|
|
|
06/30/2009
|
Withdrawn from committee. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
|
06/29/2009
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D.
|
|
|
|
05/14/2009
|
Referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D.
|
|
|
|
04/27/2009
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
04/27/2009
|
Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 1108.)
|
|
|
|
04/22/2009
|
Read second time. To Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
|
04/21/2009
|
From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (April 21).
|
|
|
|
04/02/2009
|
Referred to Com. on J.,E.D., & E.
|
|
|
|
03/23/2009
|
(Corrected March 20.)
|
|
|
|
03/12/2009
|
From printer. May be heard in committee April 11.
|
|
|
|
03/11/2009
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|