LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2009-2010 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB1556
Action History
CA
California Assembly Bill AB1556
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2009-2010 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB1556
Action History
05/07/2009
Re-referred to Com. on H. & C.D.
05/06/2009
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on H. & C.D. Read second time and amended.
04/23/2009
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
04/02/2009
Referred to Coms. on H. & C.D. and J.,E.D., & E.
03/23/2009
(Corrected March 20.)
03/12/2009
From printer. May be heard in committee April 11.
03/11/2009
Read first time. To print.