02/02/2010 | From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56. | |||
01/31/2010 | Died pursuant to Art. IV, Sec. 10(c) of the Constitution. | |||
05/28/2009 | In committee: Set, second hearing. Held under submission. | |||
05/06/2009 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. | |||
04/21/2009 | From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. Re-referred. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 21). | |||
04/15/2009 | Re-referred to Com. on J.,E.D., & E. | |||
04/13/2009 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on J.,E.D., & E. Read second time and amended. | |||
04/02/2009 | Referred to Com. on J.,E.D., & E. | |||
03/23/2009 | (Corrected March 20.) | |||
03/12/2009 | From printer. May be heard in committee April 11. | |||
03/11/2009 | Read first time. To print. |