|
08/12/2010
|
In committee: Held under submission.
|
|
|
|
08/02/2010
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR suspense file.
|
|
|
|
06/30/2010
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
06/29/2010
|
From committee: Amend, do pass as amended, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 1.) (June 28).
|
|
|
|
06/22/2010
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D.
|
|
|
|
06/14/2010
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
|
06/09/2010
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
02/25/2010
|
Re-referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D.
|
|
|
|
02/18/2010
|
Withdrawn from committee. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
|
02/04/2010
|
Re-referred to Com. on G.O.
|
|
|
|
09/08/2009
|
Read second time. To third reading. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10(c).
|
|
|
|
09/04/2009
|
From inactive file. To second reading. Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
|
|
|
|
07/16/2009
|
Ordered to third reading. To inactive file on motion of Senator Negrete McLeod.
|
|
|
|
07/15/2009
|
Ordered to Special Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
|
07/08/2009
|
Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
07/07/2009
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (July 6).
|
|
|
|
05/14/2009
|
Referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D.
|
|
|
|
04/27/2009
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
04/27/2009
|
Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 1108.)
|
|
|
|
04/22/2009
|
Read second time. To Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
|
04/21/2009
|
From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (April 21).
|
|
|
|
04/02/2009
|
Referred to Com. on J.,E.D., & E.
|
|
|
|
03/23/2009
|
(Corrected March 20.)
|
|
|
|
03/12/2009
|
From printer. May be heard in committee April 11.
|
|
|
|
03/11/2009
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|