|
01/14/2010
|
Consideration of Governor's veto stricken from file.
|
|
|
|
10/26/2009
|
Consideration of Governor's veto pending.
|
|
|
|
10/11/2009
|
Vetoed by Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/11/2009
|
Enrolled and to the Governor at 7 p.m.
|
|
|
|
09/03/2009
|
In Assembly. To enrollment.
|
|
|
|
09/02/2009
|
Read third time, passed, and to Assembly. (Ayes 24. Noes 15. Page 2125.)
|
|
|
|
08/19/2009
|
Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/18/2009
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
|
07/09/2009
|
From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Re-referred. (Ayes 4. Noes 2.) (July 8).
|
|
|
|
06/26/2009
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
06/22/2009
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
|
06/04/2009
|
Referred to Com. on L. & I.R.
|
|
|
|
05/18/2009
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
05/18/2009
|
Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 47. Noes 30. Page 1546.)
|
|
|
|
05/07/2009
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 11. Noes 5.) (May 6).
|
|
|
|
04/23/2009
|
From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Re-referred. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (April 22).
|
|
|
|
04/02/2009
|
Referred to Com. on L. & E.
|
|
|
|
03/12/2009
|
From printer. May be heard in committee April 11.
|
|
|
|
03/11/2009
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|