|
01/14/2010
|
Consideration of Governor's veto stricken from file.
|
|
|
|
10/26/2009
|
Consideration of Governor's veto pending.
|
|
|
|
10/11/2009
|
Vetoed by Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/29/2009
|
Enrolled and to the Governor at 3:30 p.m.
|
|
|
|
09/08/2009
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To enrollment. (Ayes 51. Noes 28. Page 3085.)
|
|
|
|
09/02/2009
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 4 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
|
09/01/2009
|
Read third time, passed, and to Assembly. (Ayes 23. Noes 15. Page 2067.)
|
|
|
|
08/24/2009
|
Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/20/2009
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
|
07/23/2009
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
07/09/2009
|
From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Re-referred. (Ayes 4. Noes 2.) (July 8).
|
|
|
|
06/26/2009
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
06/22/2009
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
|
06/18/2009
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on L. & I.R.
|
|
|
|
06/04/2009
|
Referred to Com. on L. & I.R.
|
|
|
|
05/18/2009
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
05/18/2009
|
Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 48. Noes 29. Page 1546.)
|
|
|
|
05/07/2009
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 11. Noes 5.) (May 6).
|
|
|
|
04/23/2009
|
From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Re-referred. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (April 22).
|
|
|
|
04/16/2009
|
Re-referred to Com. on L. & E.
|
|
|
|
04/14/2009
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on L. & E. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
04/02/2009
|
Referred to Com. on L. & E.
|
|
|
|
03/12/2009
|
From printer. May be heard in committee April 11.
|
|
|
|
03/11/2009
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|