LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2009-2010 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB1564
Action History
CA
California Assembly Bill AB1564
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2009-2010 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB1564
Action History
02/02/2010
From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
01/31/2010
Died pursuant to Art. IV, Sec. 10(c) of the Constitution.
04/22/2009
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
04/02/2009
Referred to Coms. on INS. and P.E.,R. & S.S.
03/13/2009
From printer. May be heard in committee April 12.
03/12/2009
Read first time. To print.