|
01/14/2010
|
Consideration of Governor's veto stricken from file.
|
|
|
|
10/26/2009
|
Consideration of Governor's veto pending.
|
|
|
|
10/11/2009
|
Vetoed by Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/02/2009
|
Enrolled and to the Governor at 4:15 p.m.
|
|
|
|
08/27/2009
|
In Assembly. To enrollment.
|
|
|
|
08/27/2009
|
Read third time, passed, and to Assembly. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 1980.)
|
|
|
|
08/24/2009
|
Ordered to Special Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
|
08/19/2009
|
Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/18/2009
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
|
07/09/2009
|
From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on APPR with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. Re-referred. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (July 8).
|
|
|
|
06/24/2009
|
From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on L. & I.R. Re-referred. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (June 23).
|
|
|
|
06/04/2009
|
Referred to Coms. on V.A. and L. & I.R.
|
|
|
|
05/21/2009
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
05/21/2009
|
Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 1632.)
|
|
|
|
05/18/2009
|
Read second time. To Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
|
05/14/2009
|
From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (May 13).
|
|
|
|
05/04/2009
|
From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. Re-referred. (Ayes 4. Noes 0.) (April 30).
|
|
|
|
04/29/2009
|
From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on L. & E. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. Re-referred. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (April 28).
|
|
|
|
04/02/2009
|
Referred to Coms. on V.A. and L. & E.
|
|
|
|
03/17/2009
|
From printer. May be heard in committee April 16.
|
|
|
|
03/16/2009
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|