|
10/11/2009
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 299, Statutes of 2009.
|
|
|
|
10/11/2009
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/28/2009
|
Enrolled and to the Governor at 4 p.m.
|
|
|
|
09/11/2009
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. Senate amendments concurred in. To enrollment. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 3363.)
|
|
|
|
09/11/2009
|
Withdrawn from committee. Ordered placed on third reading file. Read third time, passed, and to Assembly. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 2406.)
|
|
|
|
09/10/2009
|
Senate Rule 29.3 suspended. (Page 2380.) From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
|
09/08/2009
|
Withdrawn from committee. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
|
09/04/2009
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
08/27/2009
|
In committee: Held under submission.
|
|
|
|
08/17/2009
|
In committee: Placed on Appropriations suspense file.
|
|
|
|
07/16/2009
|
From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Re-referred. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (July 15).
|
|
|
|
07/06/2009
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
|
06/24/2009
|
From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH. Re-referred. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (June 23).
|
|
|
|
06/18/2009
|
Referred to Coms. on V.A. and HEALTH.
|
|
|
|
06/03/2009
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
06/02/2009
|
Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 1938.)
|
|
|
|
05/29/2009
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 28). Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
05/13/2009
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
|
04/29/2009
|
From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. Re-referred. (Ayes 18. Noes 0.) (April 28).
|
|
|
|
04/27/2009
|
Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
|
04/23/2009
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH. Read second time and amended. (Corrected September 3.)
|
|
|
|
04/21/2009
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
04/02/2009
|
Referred to Coms. on HEALTH and V.A.
|
|
|
|
03/17/2009
|
From printer. May be heard in committee April 16.
|
|
|
|
03/16/2009
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|