California 2009 2009-2010 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB1568 Amended / Bill

Filed 04/23/2009

 BILL NUMBER: AB 1568AMENDED BILL TEXT AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY APRIL 23, 2009 INTRODUCED BY Committee on Veterans Affairs (Salas (Chair), Cook (Vice Chair), Huber, Lieu, V. Manuel Perez, Saldana, and Yamada) MARCH 16, 2009 An act to  add Section 722 to the Military and Veterans Code   amend Section 14124.11 of the Welfare and Institutions Code  , relating to veterans. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST AB 1568, as amended, Committee on Veterans Affairs. Veterans: benefits.  Existing law establishes the Medi-Cal program, administered by the State Department of Health Care Services, under which basic health care services are provided to qualified low-income persons. Existing law requires the department, by July 1, 2009, to establish a 2-year pilot program to utilize the federal Public Assistance Reporting Information System (PARIS) to identify veterans and their dependents or survivors who are enrolled in the Medi-Cal program and assist them in obtaining federal veteran health care benefits, and to select 3 consenting counties that have in operation a United States Department of Veterans Affairs (USDVA) medical center to participate in the pilot program.   This bill would delete references to the 2-year pilot program and, instead, require the department, by July 1, 2010, to implement a program to utilize the federal PARIS to identify veterans and their dependents or survivors who are enrolled in the Medi-Cal system and assist them in obtaining federal veteran health care benefits. The bill would eliminate the requirement that the department select 3 consenting counties that have USDVA medical centers to participate in the program.   Existing law requires every state and local public agency to render the service or provide the benefits and assistance it provides to the public to every veteran on the same basis as to any other eligible person.   Existing law establishes the Medi-Cal program, administered by the State Department of Health Care Services, under which basic health care services are provided to qualified low-income persons. Existing law permits a county board of supervisors to appoint a county veterans services officer.   This bill would declare legislative intent to implement the Public Assistance and Reporting Information System (PARIS) interstate-federal match to allow the department to identify veterans enrolled in the Medi-Cal program who could receive medical benefits through the federal Veterans Health Administration that would either replace or supplement Medi-Cal benefits. The bill would require the department to work in conjunction with designated state and local entities in utilizing the PARIS to identify veterans enrolled in the Medi-Cal program, and to assist them in obtaining federal veterans' health care benefits. The bill also would require the department to work in conjunction with the Department of Veterans Affairs to develop a plan for the dissemination of PARIS match results, and to establish outreach standards and performance criteria for county veteran services offices that receive information regarding veterans identified by the PARIS.  Because the bill would impose increased duties upon county veterans services officers, this bill would create a state-mandated local program. The California Constitution requires the state to reimburse local agencies and school districts for certain costs mandated by the state. Statutory provisions establish procedures for making that reimbursement. This bill would provide that, if the Commission on State Mandates determines that the bill contains costs mandated by the state, reimbursement for those costs shall be made pursuant to these statutory provisions. Vote: majority. Appropriation: no. Fiscal committee: yes. State-mandated local program: yes. THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA DO ENACT AS FOLLOWS:  SECTION 1.   Section 14124.11 of the   Welfare and Institutions Code   is amended to read:  14124.11. (a) The department shall establish a  two-year pilot  program to utilize the federal Public Assistance Reporting Information System (PARIS) to identify veterans and their dependents or survivors who are enrolled in the Medi-Cal program and assist them in obtaining federal veteran health care benefits.  (b) The department shall select three consenting counties that have in operation a United States Department of Veterans Affairs (USDVA) medical center to participate in the pilot program.   (c)   (b)  Under the  pilot  program, the department shall exchange information with PARIS and identify veterans and their dependents or survivors who are receiving Medi-Cal benefits in the  pilot  program counties.  (d)   (c)  The department shall refer identified Medi-Cal beneficiaries who are receiving high-cost services, including long-term care, to county veteran service officers (CVSOs) to obtain information regarding, and assistance in obtaining, USDVA benefits.  (e)   (d)  Prior to commencement of the  pilot  program, the department shall do all of the following: (1) Enter into an agreement with the California Department of Veterans Affairs (CDVA) to perform CVSO outreach services in connection with the  pilot  program. The CDVA agreement shall contain performance standards that would allow the department to measure the effectiveness of the  pilot  program. (2) Enter into any agreements that are required by the federal government to utilize the PARIS system. (3) Perform any information technology activities that are necessary to utilize the PARIS system.  (f)   (e)  The department shall monitor the  two-year pilot  program, evaluate the outcomes and savings, and provide the fiscal committees of the Legislature with a report on the findings and recommendations.  If the department determines that the pilot program is cost effective, it may implement the program statewide at any time and continue operation of PARIS indefinitely.   (g)   (f)  Notwithstanding Chapter 3.5 (commencing with Section 11340) of Part 1 of Division 3 of Title 2 of the Government Code, the department may implement, interpret, or make specific, this section by means of written directives without taking further regulatory action.  (h)   (g)  The department shall implement the  pilot  program by July 1,  2009   2010  .  (i)   (h)  In order to achieve maximum cost savings the Legislature hereby determines that an expedited contract process for contracts under this section is necessary. Therefore, contracts under this section shall be exempt from the Public Contract Code and from Chapter 3 (commencing with Section 11250) of Part 1 of Division 3 of Title 2 of the Government Code.  SECTION 1.   Section 722 is added to the Military and Veterans Code, to read: 722. (a) It is the intent of the Legislature in enacting this section to implement the Public Assistance and Reporting Information System (PARIS) interstate-federal match to allow the State Department of Health Care Services to identify veterans enrolled in the Medi-Cal program who could receive medical benefits through the federal Veterans Health Administration that would either replace or supplement benefits available from the Medi-Cal program. (b) The State Department of Health Care Services shall work in conjunction with the State Department of Social Services, the Department of Veterans Affairs, county welfare departments, and other state agencies and departments, as needed, in utilizing the federal PARIS to identify veterans enrolled in the Medi-Cal program, and to assist them in obtaining federal veterans' health care benefits. (c) The State Department of Health Care Services shall work in conjunction with the Department of Veterans Affairs to do both of the following: (1) Develop a plan for the dissemination of PARIS match results to county veteran services offices (CVSOs). (2) Establish outreach standards and measurable performance criteria for CVSOs that receive information regarding veterans identified by the PARIS.  SEC. 2. If the Commission on State Mandates determines that this act contains costs mandated by the state, reimbursement to local agencies and school districts for those costs shall be made pursuant to Part 7 (commencing with Section 17500) of Division 4 of Title 2 of the Government Code. ____ CORRECTIONS Text--Page 5. ____