|
04/14/2010
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
03/17/2010
|
Re-referred to Com. on V.A.
|
|
|
|
03/15/2010
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
|
07/06/2009
|
Withdrawn from committee. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
|
07/02/2009
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on ED.
|
|
|
|
06/24/2009
|
From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on ED. Re-referred. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (June 23).
|
|
|
|
06/04/2009
|
Referred to Coms. on V.A. and ED.
|
|
|
|
05/21/2009
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
05/21/2009
|
Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 1632.)
|
|
|
|
05/19/2009
|
Read second time. To Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
|
05/18/2009
|
From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (May 12).
|
|
|
|
05/06/2009
|
From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on V.A. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. Re-referred. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (May 5).
|
|
|
|
04/02/2009
|
Referred to Coms. on HIGHER ED. and V.A.
|
|
|
|
03/17/2009
|
From printer. May be heard in committee April 16.
|
|
|
|
03/16/2009
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|