|
09/28/2010
|
Vetoed by Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/27/2010
|
Enrolled and to the Governor at 4:20 p.m.
|
|
|
|
08/25/2010
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To enrollment. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 6640.)
|
|
|
|
08/24/2010
|
From committee: With recommendation: That Senate amendments be concurred in. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (August 24).
|
|
|
|
08/16/2010
|
Re-referred to Com. on B.,P. & C.P. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2.
|
|
|
|
08/11/2010
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 13 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
|
08/11/2010
|
Read third time, passed, and to Assembly. (Ayes 34. Noes 0. Page 4454.)
|
|
|
|
08/04/2010
|
Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/03/2010
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (August 2).
|
|
|
|
07/15/2010
|
From committee: Amend, do pass as amended, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (July 1). Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
06/29/2010
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D.
|
|
|
|
06/28/2010
|
Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Page 4087.)
|
|
|
|
06/24/2010
|
Re-referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D.
|
|
|
|
06/23/2010
|
Withdrawn from committee. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
|
05/17/2010
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on T. & H.
|
|
|
|
05/06/2010
|
Re-referred to Com. on T. & H.
|
|
|
|
04/28/2010
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on N.R. & W.
|
|
|
|
09/04/2009
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
09/03/2009
|
Re-referred to Com. on N.R. & W.
|
|
|
|
09/02/2009
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading. Joint Rules 61(a)(12) and 62(a) suspended. (Ayes 32. Noes 0. Page 2115.) Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
|
09/01/2009
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (August 27).
|
|
|
|
07/13/2009
|
In committee: Placed on Appropriations suspense file.
|
|
|
|
07/06/2009
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
|
06/24/2009
|
From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Re-referred. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (June 23).
|
|
|
|
06/18/2009
|
Referred to Com. on V.A.
|
|
|
|
06/04/2009
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
06/03/2009
|
Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 77. Noes 1. Page 2016.)
|
|
|
|
06/02/2009
|
Read third time, amended, and returned to third reading. (Page 1976.).
|
|
|
|
05/14/2009
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (May 13).
|
|
|
|
04/29/2009
|
From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Re-referred. (Ayes 5. Noes 1.) (April 28).
|
|
|
|
04/20/2009
|
Re-referred to Com. on V.A.
|
|
|
|
04/16/2009
|
Referred to Com. on V.A. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on V.A. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
03/17/2009
|
From printer. May be heard in committee April 16.
|
|
|
|
03/16/2009
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|