|
10/11/2009
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 546, Statutes of 2009.
|
|
|
|
10/11/2009
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/28/2009
|
Enrolled and to the Governor at 4 p.m.
|
|
|
|
09/11/2009
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To enrollment. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 3351.)
|
|
|
|
09/10/2009
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending.
|
|
|
|
09/09/2009
|
Read third time, passed, and to Assembly. (Ayes 31. Noes 0. Page 2314.)
|
|
|
|
09/01/2009
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/31/2009
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (August 27).
|
|
|
|
08/17/2009
|
In committee: Placed on Appropriations suspense file.
|
|
|
|
07/23/2009
|
From committee: Amend, do pass as amended, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (July 15). Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
07/06/2009
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
|
07/02/2009
|
Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
|
06/24/2009
|
From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on RLS. Re-referred. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (June 23).
|
|
|
|
06/18/2009
|
Referred to Com. on V.A. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on V.A.
|
|
|
|
06/03/2009
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
06/02/2009
|
Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 73. Noes 2. Page 1977.)
|
|
|
|
05/26/2009
|
Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
05/21/2009
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (May 20).
|
|
|
|
04/29/2009
|
From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Re-referred. (Ayes 8. Noes 1.) (April 28).
|
|
|
|
04/22/2009
|
From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on V.A. Re-referred. (Ayes 14. Noes 2.) (April 21).
|
|
|
|
04/02/2009
|
Referred to Coms. on HEALTH and V.A.
|
|
|
|
03/17/2009
|
From printer. May be heard in committee April 16.
|
|
|
|
03/16/2009
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|