|
10/11/2009
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 547, Statutes of 2009.
|
|
|
|
10/11/2009
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/29/2009
|
Enrolled and to the Governor at 3:30 p.m.
|
|
|
|
09/08/2009
|
In Assembly. To enrollment.
|
|
|
|
09/04/2009
|
Read third time, passed, and to Assembly. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 2224.)
|
|
|
|
09/02/2009
|
Ordered to Special Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
|
09/01/2009
|
Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/31/2009
|
From inactive file. To second reading.
|
|
|
|
06/22/2009
|
From Consent Calendar. To third reading. To inactive file on motion of Senator Hancock.
|
|
|
|
06/17/2009
|
Read second time. To Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
|
06/16/2009
|
From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (June 16).
|
|
|
|
05/21/2009
|
Referred to Com. on E., R., & C.A.
|
|
|
|
05/11/2009
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
05/11/2009
|
Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 1370.)
|
|
|
|
05/05/2009
|
From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (May 5).
|
|
|
|
04/02/2009
|
Referred to Com. on E. & R.
|
|
|
|
03/18/2009
|
From printer. May be heard in committee April 17.
|
|
|
|
03/17/2009
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|