|
10/14/2009
|
Read third time, passed, and to Assembly. (Ayes 34. Noes 2. Page 2531.)
|
|
|
|
09/10/2009
|
Read third time, passage refused. (Ayes 24. Noes 8. Page 2393.) Motion to reconsider made by Senator Price. Reconsideration granted. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 2394.)
|
|
|
|
09/08/2009
|
Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
09/04/2009
|
Read third time, amended. To second reading.
|
|
|
|
08/18/2009
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
|
07/08/2009
|
From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Re-referred. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (July 8).
|
|
|
|
06/11/2009
|
Referred to Com. on G.O.
|
|
|
|
05/27/2009
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
05/26/2009
|
Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 72. Noes 2. Page 1665.)
|
|
|
|
05/14/2009
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (May 13).
|
|
|
|
05/04/2009
|
From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Re-referred. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (April 30).
|
|
|
|
03/24/2009
|
From printer. May be heard in committee April 23.
|
|
|
|
03/23/2009
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|