09/11/2009 | To inactive file on motion of Senator Romero. | |||
08/19/2009 | Read second time. To third reading. | |||
08/18/2009 | From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. | |||
07/08/2009 | From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on APPR with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. Re-referred. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (July 8). | |||
06/11/2009 | Referred to Com. on G.O. | |||
05/27/2009 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | |||
05/26/2009 | Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 76. Noes 1. Page 1665.) | |||
05/14/2009 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (May 13). | |||
05/04/2009 | From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. Re-referred. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (April 30). | |||
03/24/2009 | From printer. May be heard in committee April 23. | |||
03/23/2009 | Read first time. To print. |