|
08/06/2009
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 86, Statutes of 2009.
|
|
|
|
08/05/2009
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
07/30/2009
|
Enrolled and to the Governor at 1 p.m.
|
|
|
|
07/01/2009
|
Withdrawn from Governor. Ordered returned to enrollment.
|
|
|
|
06/25/2009
|
Enrolled and to the Governor at 1:30 p.m.
|
|
|
|
06/22/2009
|
In Assembly. To enrollment.
|
|
|
|
06/22/2009
|
Read third time, passed, and to Assembly. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 1376.)
|
|
|
|
06/16/2009
|
Ordered to Special Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
|
06/10/2009
|
Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
06/09/2009
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 9).
|
|
|
|
04/30/2009
|
Referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
|
03/23/2009
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
03/23/2009
|
Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 624.)
|
|
|
|
03/17/2009
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (March 17).
|
|
|
|
02/26/2009
|
Referred to Com. on B. & P.
|
|
|
|
01/28/2009
|
From printer. May be heard in committee February 27.
|
|
|
|
01/27/2009
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|