|
09/08/2009
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 10 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
|
09/04/2009
|
Read third time, passed, and to Assembly. (Ayes 22. Noes 17. Page 2209.)
|
|
|
|
09/01/2009
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/31/2009
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 8. Noes 5.) (August 27).
|
|
|
|
08/25/2009
|
From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Re-referred. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (August 24).
|
|
|
|
08/18/2009
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on REV. & TAX.
|
|
|
|
07/08/2009
|
In committee: Referred to REV. & TAX. suspense file.
|
|
|
|
06/11/2009
|
Referred to Com. on REV. & TAX.
|
|
|
|
05/28/2009
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
05/28/2009
|
Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 1769.)
|
|
|
|
05/26/2009
|
Read second time. To Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
|
05/21/2009
|
From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (May 20).
|
|
|
|
05/18/2009
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
05/14/2009
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
04/28/2009
|
From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. Re-referred. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (April 27).
|
|
|
|
03/27/2009
|
From printer. May be heard in committee April 26.
|
|
|
|
03/26/2009
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|