|
08/31/2010
|
To inactive file on motion of Senator Romero.
|
|
|
|
08/30/2010
|
Re-referred to Com. on RLS. Withdrawn from committee. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/27/2010
|
From committee: Return to Senate floor for consideration. (Ayes 4. Noes 2.) Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/23/2010
|
Read second time. To third reading. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10. From committee: Be re-referred to Com. on EQ. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10. (Ayes 3. Noes 0.) Re-referred to Com. on EQ.
|
|
|
|
08/20/2010
|
Read third time, amended. To second reading.
|
|
|
|
08/03/2010
|
Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/02/2010
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
|
06/29/2010
|
From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Re-referred. (Ayes 6. Noes 1.) (June 28).
|
|
|
|
06/23/2010
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on EQ.
|
|
|
|
05/21/2009
|
Referred to Com. on EQ.
|
|
|
|
05/11/2009
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
05/11/2009
|
Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 1369.)
|
|
|
|
05/06/2009
|
Read second time. To Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
|
05/05/2009
|
From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (May 4).
|
|
|
|
04/27/2009
|
Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES. In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
|
04/23/2009
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on NAT. RES. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
04/13/2009
|
Referred to Com. on NAT. RES.
|
|
|
|
03/31/2009
|
From printer. May be heard in committee April 30.
|
|
|
|
03/27/2009
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|