LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2009-2010 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB1582
Compare Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill AB1582
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2009-2010 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB1582
Compare Versions
AB1582 Chaptered August 6, 2009
AB1582 Enrolled July 9, 2009
AB1582 Amended June 10, 2009
AB1582 Amended May 6, 2009
AB1582 Introduced March 31, 2009
Version 1 (Old)
AB1582 Chaptered August 6, 2009
AB1582 Enrolled July 9, 2009
AB1582 Amended June 10, 2009
AB1582 Amended May 6, 2009
AB1582 Introduced March 31, 2009
Version 2 (New)
Compare