California 2009-2010 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB1584 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill May 26, 2009

Enrolled

Bill September 17, 2009

Chaptered

Bill October 11, 2009

Amended

Bill September 1, 2009
Bill June 18, 2009