|
07/15/2010
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 78, Statutes of 2010.
|
|
|
|
07/15/2010
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
07/07/2010
|
Enrolled and to the Governor at 2 p.m.
|
|
|
|
07/01/2010
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To enrollment. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 5922.)
|
|
|
|
06/28/2010
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after June 30 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
|
06/28/2010
|
Read third time, passed, and to Assembly. (Ayes 32. Noes 0. Page 4100.)
|
|
|
|
06/23/2010
|
Ordered to Special Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
|
06/16/2010
|
Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
06/15/2010
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 15).
|
|
|
|
06/09/2010
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
|
02/04/2010
|
Referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
|
01/25/2010
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
01/25/2010
|
Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 67. Noes 0. Page 3859.)
|
|
|
|
01/13/2010
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (January 12).
|
|
|
|
09/03/2009
|
From printer. May be heard in committee October 3.
|
|
|
|
09/02/2009
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|