LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2009-2010 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB1588
Action History
CA
California Assembly Bill AB1588
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2009-2010 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB1588
Action History
02/22/2010
From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
02/12/2010
Re-referred to Com. on B. & F.
02/11/2010
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on B. & F. Read second time and amended.
01/31/2010
Died pursuant to Art. IV, Sec. 10(c) of the Constitution.
10/26/2009
Referred to Com. on B. & F.
09/10/2009
From printer. May be heard in committee October 10.
09/09/2009
Read first time. To print.