02/02/2010 | From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56. | |||
01/31/2010 | Died pursuant to Art. IV, Sec. 10(c) of the Constitution. | |||
01/21/2010 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. In committee: Set, first hearing. Held under submission. | |||
01/14/2010 | From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Re-referred. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (January 14). | |||
01/12/2010 | From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on JUD. Re-referred. (Ayes 4. Noes 0.) (January 12). | |||
01/11/2010 | Assembly Rule 56 suspended. Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Page 3746.) | |||
01/06/2010 | Re-referred to Com. on HUM. S. | |||
01/05/2010 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HUM. S. Read second time and amended. | |||
01/04/2010 | Referred to Coms. on HUM. S. and JUD. | |||
09/14/2009 | From printer. May be heard in committee October 14. | |||
09/12/2009 | Read first time. To print. |