02/02/2010 | From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56. | |||
01/31/2010 | Died pursuant to Art. IV, Sec. 10(c) of the Constitution. | |||
04/23/2009 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. | |||
03/26/2009 | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |||
03/25/2009 | Read second time and amended. | |||
03/24/2009 | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 19. Noes 0.) (March 17). | |||
03/11/2009 | Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. | |||
03/10/2009 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH. Read second time and amended. | |||
02/26/2009 | Referred to Com. on HEALTH. | |||
01/28/2009 | From printer. May be heard in committee February 27. | |||
01/27/2009 | Read first time. To print. |