02/02/2010 | Died on third reading file. | |||
01/28/2010 | Read second time. To third reading. | |||
01/27/2010 | Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. | |||
01/26/2010 | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (January 21). | |||
01/21/2010 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. | |||
01/14/2010 | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96. | |||
01/12/2010 | From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on BUDGET. Re-referred. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (January 12). | |||
01/07/2010 | Re-referred to Com. on B. & P. | |||
01/06/2010 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on B. & P. Read second time and amended. | |||
01/04/2010 | Read first time. Referred to Coms. on B. & P. and BUDGET. | |||
12/03/2009 | From printer. May be heard in committee January 2. | |||
12/02/2009 | Introduced. To print. |