|
08/23/2010
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 163, Statutes of 2010.
|
|
|
|
08/23/2010
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
08/19/2010
|
Enrolled and to the Governor at 5:20 p.m.
|
|
|
|
08/19/2010
|
From committee: With recommendation: That Senate amendments be concurred in. (Ayes 5. Noes 1.) (August 19). Assembly Rule 77 suspended. (Page 6374.) Urgency clause adopted. Senate amendments concurred in. To enrollment. (Ayes 73. Noes 4. Page 6374.)
|
|
|
|
08/18/2010
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 20 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. Re-referred to Com. on P.E.,R. & S.S. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2. Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Page 6339.)
|
|
|
|
08/18/2010
|
Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed and to Assembly. (Ayes 31. Noes 1. Page 4588.)
|
|
|
|
08/11/2010
|
Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/10/2010
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (August 9).
|
|
|
|
08/04/2010
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
08/03/2010
|
From committee: Amend, do pass as amended, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (August 3).
|
|
|
|
08/02/2010
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on P.E. & R.
|
|
|
|
06/10/2010
|
Referred to Com. on P.E. & R.
|
|
|
|
06/03/2010
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
06/02/2010
|
Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 49. Noes 24. Page 5507.)
|
|
|
|
05/28/2010
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (May 28). Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
04/21/2010
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
|
04/07/2010
|
From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Re-referred. (Ayes 4. Noes 1.) (April 7).
|
|
|
|
01/14/2010
|
Referred to Com. on P.E.,R. & S.S.
|
|
|
|
01/05/2010
|
From printer. May be heard in committee February 4.
|
|
|
|
01/04/2010
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|