|
09/29/2010
|
Vetoed by Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/02/2010
|
Enrolled and to the Governor at 3:45 p.m.
|
|
|
|
08/23/2010
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To enrollment. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 6468.)
|
|
|
|
08/19/2010
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 21 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
|
08/19/2010
|
Read third time, passed, and to Assembly. (Ayes 35. Noes 0. Page 4681.)
|
|
|
|
08/17/2010
|
Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/16/2010
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (August 12). Received August 13 pursuant to JR 61(b)(14).
|
|
|
|
08/04/2010
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
07/15/2010
|
In committee: Placed on APPR suspense file.
|
|
|
|
06/23/2010
|
From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Re-referred. (Ayes 4. Noes 0.) (June 22).
|
|
|
|
06/17/2010
|
From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on V.A. Re-referred. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (June 16).
|
|
|
|
06/10/2010
|
Referred to Coms. on HEALTH and V.A.
|
|
|
|
06/03/2010
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
06/02/2010
|
Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 5449.)
|
|
|
|
05/28/2010
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 28). Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
|
|
|
|
04/14/2010
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
|
03/24/2010
|
From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Re-referred. (Ayes 18. Noes 0.) (March 23).
|
|
|
|
01/14/2010
|
Referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
|
01/05/2010
|
From printer. May be heard in committee February 4.
|
|
|
|
01/04/2010
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|