02/02/2010 | From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56. | |||
01/31/2010 | Died pursuant to Art. IV, Sec. 10(c) of the Constitution. | |||
05/28/2009 | In committee: Set, second hearing. Held under submission. | |||
04/29/2009 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. | |||
04/15/2009 | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |||
04/14/2009 | Read second time and amended. | |||
04/13/2009 | From committee: Amend, do pass as amended, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (March 31). | |||
02/05/2009 | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. | |||
12/02/2008 | From printer. May be heard in committee January 1. | |||
12/01/2008 | Read first time. To print. |