California 2009-2010 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB1601 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 4, 2010

Enrolled

Bill August 30, 2010

Chaptered

Bill September 27, 2010

Amended

Bill August 17, 2010
Bill July 15, 2010
Bill May 28, 2010
Bill February 4, 2010