05/13/2010 | Re-referred to Com. on REV. & TAX. | |||
05/12/2010 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on REV. & TAX. Read second time and amended. | |||
05/10/2010 | In committee: Set, second hearing. Referred to REV. & TAX. suspense file. In committee: Set, second hearing. Held under submission. | |||
04/12/2010 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | |||
03/22/2010 | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. | |||
01/14/2010 | Referred to Com. on REV. & TAX. | |||
01/06/2010 | From printer. May be heard in committee February 5. | |||
01/05/2010 | Read first time. To print. |