08/31/2010 | Read third time. Urgency clause refused adoption. (Ayes 50. Noes 28. Page 6912.) Motion to reconsider made by Assembly Member Charles Calderon. | |||
08/30/2010 | Assembly Rule 96 suspended. (Ayes 50. Noes 27. Page 6820.) Withdrawn from committee. Ordered to third reading. | |||
08/11/2010 | Re-referred to Com. on BUDGET. | |||
08/10/2010 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on BUDGET. Read second time and amended. | |||
01/21/2010 | Referred to Com. on BUDGET. | |||
01/12/2010 | From printer. May be heard in committee February 11. (Corrected February 1.) | |||
01/11/2010 | Read first time. | |||
01/08/2010 | Introduced. To print. |