06/15/2009 | In committee: Set, second hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | |||
06/08/2009 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | |||
04/30/2009 | Referred to Com. on JUD. | |||
04/02/2009 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | |||
04/02/2009 | Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 759.) | |||
03/26/2009 | Read second time. To Consent Calendar. | |||
03/25/2009 | Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. | |||
03/24/2009 | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. To Consent Calendar. (March 23). | |||
02/26/2009 | Referred to Com. on B. & F. | |||
01/28/2009 | From printer. May be heard in committee February 27. | |||
01/27/2009 | Read first time. To print. |