10/08/2010 | Read third time. Urgency clause refused adoption. (Ayes 25. Noes 11. Page 5255.) | |||
10/07/2010 | Read third time and amended. Senate Rule 29.3 suspended. Joint Rule 10.5 suspended. (Page 5227.) | |||
08/09/2010 | Read second time. To third reading. | |||
08/05/2010 | Withdrawn from committee. Ordered placed on second reading file. | |||
04/27/2010 | Referred to Com. on RLS. | |||
04/22/2010 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | |||
04/22/2010 | Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 45. Noes 7. Page 4799.) | |||
04/19/2010 | Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. | |||
04/15/2010 | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (April 15). | |||
04/12/2010 | Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Page 4592.) | |||
01/21/2010 | Referred to Com. on BUDGET. | |||
01/12/2010 | From printer. May be heard in committee February 11. | |||
01/11/2010 | Read first time. To print. |